~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 10 2015 |
Application (14A1176) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 3, 2015 to August 2, 2015, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
May 14 2015 |
Application (14A1176) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 2, 2015. |
Aug 3 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 4, 2015) |
Aug 13 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 5, 2015. |
Oct 5 2015 |
Brief of respondent Life Insurance Company of North America in opposition filed. |
Oct 20 2015 |
Reply of petitioners Todd R. Rochow, Personal Representative of the Estate of Daniel J. Rochow, et al., filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 21 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 6, 2015. |
Oct 28 2015 |
Letter from counsel including Rule 29.6 statement of respondent Life Insurance Company of North America filed. (Distributed) |
Nov 9 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |